Global Patent Index - EP 0970725 A2

EP 0970725 A2 2000-01-12 - Life-saving device

Title (en)

Life-saving device

Title (de)

Rettungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sauvetage

Publication

EP 0970725 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99850115 A

Priority

SE 9802452 A

Abstract (en)

A life-saving device (1) for enabling gripping ice when a user is to pull himself out of a hole in the ice, which in one end exhibits an engagement part (3) comprising a point-shaped means (4) for engaging with the ice, as well as a handle part (2). The engagement part (3) exhibits a tubular cross-section with a circumferential wall and with a centre axis extending in the longitudinal direction of the device (1). Furthermore, the engagement part (3) exhibits a plurality of point-forming means (4) which are formed in the circumferential wall and distributed along the periphery of the same. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 33/00 (2006.01); A62B 99/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 99/00 (2013.01); A62B 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970725 A2 20000112; EP 0970725 A3 20010919; SE 510985 C2 19990719; SE 9802452 D0 19980708; SE 9802452 L 19990719

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041029

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 62B 33/00 A

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI