Global patent index - EP 0970726 A2

EP 0970726 A2 2000-01-12 - Device for locating a nested object by a belt fastener

Title (en)

Device for locating a nested object by a belt fastener

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Fixieren eines durch eine Bandschlinge gesteckten Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixer un objet emboîté par une attache à sangle

Publication

EP 0970726 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890218 A

Priority

AT 45498 U

Abstract (en)

An enclosure piece narrowing the sling (6) holding it and pulled over it is formed by a loop (2) positioned crosswise to a loop (1) to which it is joined. The loop (1) is inverted over the sling. The two loops are at right angles to each other and at least one of them is in the form of a flat, elastic belt and is elastic. The loop inserted into the sling has a smaller opening (4). The two loops are sewn, stuck, riveted or welded together where they overlap (3).

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung zum Fixieren eines durch eine Bandschlinge, wie eine Expressschlinge (6), gesteckten Gegenstandes, wie eines Karabiners (14), mit einem im montierten Zustand die Schlinge (6) einengenden Umschließungsteil, welcher durch eine Schlaufe (2) gebildet ist, die rechtwinkelig zu einer zum Einstecken in die Schlinge (6) vorgesehenen Schlaufe (1) angeordnet und mit dieser fest verbunden ist, und die über die Schlinge (6) stülpbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970726 A2 20000112; EP 0970726 A3 20000412; AT 2772 U1 19990426

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030604

2001-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 63B 29/00 A, 7A 63B 29/02 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI