Global Patent Index - EP 0970726 A3

EP 0970726 A3 2000-04-12 - Device for locating a nested object by a belt fastener

Title (en)

Device for locating a nested object by a belt fastener

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Fixieren eines durch eine Bandschlinge gesteckten Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixer un objet emboîté par une attache à sangle

Publication

EP 0970726 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890218 A

Priority

AT 45498 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0970726A2] An enclosure piece narrowing the sling (6) holding it and pulled over it is formed by a loop (2) positioned crosswise to a loop (1) to which it is joined. The loop (1) is inverted over the sling. The two loops are at right angles to each other and at least one of them is in the form of a flat, elastic belt and is elastic. The loop inserted into the sling has a smaller opening (4). The two loops are sewn, stuck, riveted or welded together where they overlap (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 29/00; A63B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970726 A2 20000112; EP 0970726 A3 20000412; AT 2772 U1 19990426

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030604

2001-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63B 29/00 A, 7A 63B 29/02 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI