Global patent index - EP 0970728 A2

EP 0970728 A2 2000-01-12 - Wheel assembly for in-line roller skates

Title (en)

Wheel assembly for in-line roller skates

Title (de)

Laufrollen-Kombination für Einspurrollschuhe

Title (fr)

Jeu de roulettes pour patins à roulettes en ligne

Publication

EP 0970728 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99109225 A

Priority

US 11129398 A

Abstract (en)

In an in-line roller skate, a wheel bearing assembly (136) comprises an axle (240), a bearing spacer (220) axially disposed about the axle, and a pair of wheel bearings (230) axially coupled to and spaced apart by the bearing spacer (220). A magnet carrying sleeve (200) is juxtaposed between the wheel bearings (230) and concentric with the axle (240). At least one magnet (210) is disposed in the body portion (204) of the sleeve (200), and alternatively includes a second magnet disposed in diametric opposition relative to the first magnet. Alternatively, the second "magnet" is a similarly weighted non-magnetic element. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/06; A63C 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/06 (2006.01); A63C 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/06 (2013.01); A63C 17/223 (2013.01); A63C 2203/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 5649716 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970728 A2 20000112; EP 0970728 A3 20011024

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI