Global patent index - EP 0970733 A3

EP 0970733 A3 2000-07-12 - Heater, in particular for treatment of cork by boiling, method relating thereto

Title (en)

Heater, in particular for treatment of cork by boiling, method relating thereto

Title (de)

Kochvorrichtung, insbesondere zur Behandlung von Korkmaterial durch Kochen und Verfahren hierzu

Title (fr)

Bouilleur ,notamment pour le traitement de liège par bouillant et procédé Y relatif

Publication

EP 0970733 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99111558 A

Priority

  • EP 99111558 A
  • EP 98111441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0970733A2] A heater (1) comprises a chamber (4) bounded by walls (10) suitable for containing products (2) to be treated, heat exchange means (7) having exchanging surfaces suitable for transferring heat to a mass of liquid for the treatment of said products (2); said exchanging surfaces are disjoined from said walls (10). A method for treating products (2) by a heater (1) comprises: loading said products (2) into a treating chamber (4) bounded by walls (10) suitable for containing said products (2); treating said products (2) by a mass of liquid; unloading said products (2) from said chamber (4); said loading and said unloading take place through a closable opening (9) obtained in a side part (10) of said walls. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01B 1/00; B27K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] DE 2362500 A1 19740627 - XORELLA AG
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 174 (M - 1109) 2 May 1991 (1991-05-02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970733 A2 20000112; EP 0970733 A3 20000712

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OFFICINE NINO SATTA DI RITA SATTA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-08-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040514

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR IT PT

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01B 1/00 A, 7B 27K 7/00 B

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SATTA, GIOVANNI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI