Global Patent Index - EP 0970779 A2

EP 0970779 A2 2000-01-12 - Process for laser treating a metallic surface

Title (en)

Process for laser treating a metallic surface

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bearbeitung einer metallischen Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement d une surface métallique

Publication

EP 0970779 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110754 A

Priority

DE 19830215 A

Abstract (en)

The surface (4) has particles of a deep fine structure from radiation in several stages. The surface is first given a deep coarse structure to form an embossing surface. The surface is next given a deep fine structure in a first radiation stage, with an initial surface roughness. A protective layer is coated over the surface in the area of the troughs (6) of the coarse structure. The peaks (8) protruding from the protective layer are provided with a fine structure with a second surface roughness, by radiating with particles (12) in a second radiation stage or by etching or other method.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Bearbeitung einer metallischen Oerfläche. Die Oberfläche wird zur Bildung einer Prägeoberfläche zunächst mit einer Tiefengrobstruktur versehen. Danach wird die Oberfläche in einer ersten Bestrahlungsstufe durch Bestrahlen mit Partikeln oder durch Ätzen oder dergleichen mit einer Tiefenfeinstruktur mit einer ersten Rauhtiefe versehen. Danach wird die mit der Tiefenfeinstruktur mit der ersten Rauhtiefe versehene Oberfläche im Bereich der Täler der Tiefengrobstruktur mit einer Schutzschicht versehen, wonach die aus der Schutzschicht herausragenden Höhen der Tiefengrobstruktur durch Bestrahlen mit Partikeln oder Ätzen oder dergleichen mit einer Tiefenfeinstruktur mit einer zweiten Rauhtiefe versehen und schließlich die Schutzschicht entfernt wird. Mit einer nach diesem Verfahren bearbeiteten Prägeoberfläche lassen sich unterschiedliche Effekte im Aussehen einer geprägten Folie erzielen. Handelt es sich bei der Tiefengrobstruktur um die Abformung einer Oberfläche natürlichen Leders, so läßt sich dessen Aussehen in hohem Maße nachahmen, wenn die Rauhtiefe der Prägeoberfläche im Bereich der Höhen größer ist als im Bereich der Tiefen, was dann beim geprägten Produkt umgekehrt der Fall ist. Die Höhen sind dann glänzender als die Tiefen, was dem Aussehen natürlichen Leders entspricht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 1/00; B24C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/04 (2006.01); B44C 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/221 (2013.01); B24C 1/04 (2013.01); B44C 1/227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970779 A2 20000112; EP 0970779 A3 20021016; EP 0970779 B1 20031001; BR 9902545 A 20000314; CA 2273773 A1 20000107; DE 19830215 C1 20000203; ES 2209281 T3 20040616; US 6352646 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140604

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-08-27 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-06-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209281

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR TREATING A METALLIC SURFACE

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR TREATING A METALLIC SURFACE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI