Global Patent Index - EP 0970784 A2

EP 0970784 A2 2000-01-12 - Cutting device for rolls of web material

Title (en)

Cutting device for rolls of web material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Bandmaterialrollen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour couper des rouleaux

Publication

EP 0970784 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99109915 A

Priority

IT MI981573 A

Abstract (en)

A device for cutting rolls of web material from logs (4) advancing in one or more channels (3), comprising at least one cutting blade (5) driven in rotation around an axis of fulcrum (X), in which the means for moving the blade (5) give its axis (X) a substantially elliptical trajectory. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970784 A2 20000112; EP 0970784 A3 20020605; EP 0970784 B1 20040317; DE 69915545 D1 20040422; DE 69915545 T2 20050324; ES 2218902 T3 20041116; IT MI981573 A1 20000110

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160520

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160521

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69915545

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150520

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218902 T3

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915545 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY ITALIA S.P.A.

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITALCONVERTING S.P.A.

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI