Global Patent Index - EP 0970790 A2

EP 0970790 A2 2000-01-12 - Mixer for manufacturing blocks of stone material

Title (en)

Mixer for manufacturing blocks of stone material

Title (de)

Mischer für die Herstellung von Blöcken aus Steinmaterial

Title (fr)

Mélangeur pour la fabrication de blocs à partir d'un matériau pierreux

Publication

EP 0970790 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99201970 A

Priority

IT TV980023 U

Abstract (en)

In a mixer operating under vacuum for the preparation of a mixture for the production of blocks of stone material, for permitting the addition of additives, in particular colouring agents, during the mixing cycle without having to restore the atmospheric pressure in the mixture and then to add the additive and thereafter to provide again vacuum, there is mounted on the vacuum-tight cover (18) of the mixer at least one metering device (20), which is preferably also maintained under the same vacuum, comprising a hopper (30,32) which is closed at the bottom by an element or cylinder (42) which has a plurality of cavities (50) suitable for being filled with the additive or colouring agent contained in the hopper (30,32). The plurality of cavities (50) are arranged alternately with angular offsetting of 180 DEG so that, by rotating the cylinder (42) through 180 DEG , the cavities (50) filled with the additive are caused to be discharged into the mixing chamber (10) of the mixer without communication being established between the mixing chamber (10), which is under vacuum, and the outside, which is under atmospheric pressure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 3/00; B28C 5/46; B28C 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/06 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); B28C 5/14 (2006.01); B28C 5/46 (2006.01); B28C 7/06 (2006.01); B28C 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0219 (2013.01); B01F 13/06 (2013.01); B28C 5/146 (2013.01); B28C 5/464 (2013.01); B28C 7/067 (2013.01); B28C 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970790 A2 20000112; EP 0970790 A3 20011017; EP 0970790 B1 20040204; DE 69914539 D1 20040311; ES 2213976 T3 20040901; IT 245517 Y1 20020322; IT TV980023 U1 20000107; TR 9901566 A2 20000221

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-06-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213976 T3

2004-05-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914539 P 20040311

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011211

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28C 3/00 A, 7B 28C 7/14 B, 7B 28C 5/46 B, 7B 01F 15/02 B, 7B 01F 13/06 -

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI