Global patent index - EP 0970803 A1

EP 0970803 A1 2000-01-12 - Hydraulic press

Title (en)

Hydraulic press

Title (de)

Hydraulische Presse

Title (fr)

Presse hydraulique

Publication

EP 0970803 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890215 A

Priority

AT 45698 U

Abstract (en)

The press as a bottom appliance and a vertically movable top cheek movable by at least one operating cylinder (A), especially its piston rod. At least part of the hydraulic controls (3-6,10-12,14-16) is integrated in the cylinder base and or cylinder pipe (2). At least the housings for the control valves (4,6,15) and the pipes (3,5,8,10-12,14) for the hydraulic medium from and to the operating chambers (7,9) of the operating cylinder are integrated in the cylinder base and or the cylinder pipe.

Abstract (de)

Eine hydraulische Presse, insbesondere Abkantpresse, ist mit einem unteren Werkzeug, einer durch den zumindest einen Arbeitszylinder, insbesondere dessen Kolbenstange, im wesentlichen vertikal bewegbaren Oberwange und Steuereinrichtungen ausgerüstet, wobei wobei zumindest ein Teil der hydraulischen Steuereinrichtungen (3-6, 10-12, 14-16) in den Zylinderboden und/oder das Zylinderrohr (2) integriert ist. Um eine erhöhte Sicherheitsstufe zu bieten, bei der die Gefahr der Verletzung der an der Presse arbeitenden Menschen und der Beschädigung des Werkzeugs und des Werkstücks vermindert ist, sind zumindest die Gehäuse für die Steuerventile (4, 6, 15) und die Leitungen (3, 5, 8, 10-12, 14) für das Hydraulikmedium von und zu den Arbeitsräumen (7, 9) des Arbeitszylinders (A) in den Zylinderboden und/oder das einstückig mit diesem ausgeführte Zylinderrohr (2) integriert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/32; F15B 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/32 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/202 (2013.01); B30B 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970803 A1 20000112; AT 3110 U1 19991025

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI