Global patent index - EP 0970813 A2

EP 0970813 A2 2000-01-12 - Liquid containment and dispensing device

Title (en)

Liquid containment and dispensing device

Title (de)

Behälter- und Ausgabevorrichtung für Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rétention et de distribution de liquide

Publication

EP 0970813 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99111924 A

Priority

US 10380398 A

Abstract (en)

A diaphragm 24 for attaching to a free edge of a perimetrical wall 18 of a pumping chamber 16 of a chassis 12 of a liquid containment and dispensing device 10, said diaphragm being preshaped to have a raised central portion 24a surrounded by a planar edge portion 24b. The raised central portion of the diaphragm permits the diaphragm, when secured to a free edge of the perimetrical wall, to flex with respect to the pumping chamber without leading to the formation of wrinkles in the planar edge portion. The diaphragm has an innermost layer 24c of LDPE, and the planar edge portion thereof is secured by heatstaking to the free edge of the perimetrical wall of the chassis, which is formed by molding from a plastic material. An aluminum crimp ring 26 is provided to tightly retain the planar edge portion of the diaphragm against the free edge of the perimetrical wall of the chassis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/76 (2006.01); B05B 1/02 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17559 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/17596 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YD] EP 0741038 A2
  • [Y] WO 9822290 A1
  • [Y] EP 0567270 A2
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 090 (M-1218), 5 March 1992 (1992-03-05) & JP 03 272859 A (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD), 4 December 1991 (1991-12-04)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 164 (M-313), 28 July 1984 (1984-07-28) & JP 59 059455 A (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK), 5 April 1984 (1984-04-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970813 A2 20000112; EP 0970813 A3 20010829; BR 9903277 A 20000425; CA 2275370 A1 19991224; ID 23701 A 20000511; JP 2000025862 A 20000125; KR 20000006333 A 20000125; SG 72962 A1 20000523; TW 415890 B 20001221

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020103

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI