Global patent index - EP 0970864 A2

EP 0970864 A2 2000-01-12 - Bearing device for a suport cable

Title (en)

Bearing device for a suport cable

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für ein Tragseil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour un câble porteur

Publication

EP 0970864 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99105211 A

Priority

CH 146898 A

Abstract (en)

A support for the load cable of a cable car system has the cable (3) gripped by clamps (1h) at the end of a jointed linkage (1c,1e) whose inner end is attached to the support pillar (2) via a joint (1b). The whole linkage allows displacement of the cable in a vertical plane and braces against lateral displacement. The vertical displacement is associated with displacements along the cable track.

Abstract (de)

Die Haltevorrichtung (1) für ein Tragseil (3) eines schwebenden Transportmittels, insbesondere einer Luftseilbahn, umfasst ein erstes Halteteil (1h) zum Halten des Tragseils (3) in einer Längsrichtung (L), und umfasst ein zweites, an einem ortsfesten Träger (2) befestigbares Halteteil (1b), wobei die beiden Halteteil (1h,1b) durch ein Verbindungsteil (1c,1e;1e) derart gegenseitig beweglich verbunden sind, dass die beiden Halteteil (1h,1b) einerseits in einer Bewegungsrichtung (H) gegenseitig beweglich sind, wobei die Bewegungsrichtung (H) derart verläuft, dass sie zusammen mit der Längsrichtung (L) eine Ebene (5) definiert, und dass die beiden Halteteil (1b,1h) andererseits in einer bezüglich der Ebene (5) senkrecht verlaufenden Querrichtung (Q) an einer gegenseitigen Relativbewegung gehindert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/02; B61B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/02 (2006.01); B61B 12/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2013.01); B61B 12/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970864 A2 20000112; EP 0970864 A3 20000906; EP 0970864 B1 20031203; AT 255515 T 20031215

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150303

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROPETRANS AG

2003-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: BEARING DEVICE FOR A SUPPORT CABLE

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI