Global Patent Index - EP 0970864 A3

EP 0970864 A3 2000-09-06 - Bearing device for a suport cable

Title (en)

Bearing device for a suport cable

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für ein Tragseil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour un câble porteur

Publication

EP 0970864 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105211 A

Priority

CH 146898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0970864A2] A support for the load cable of a cable car system has the cable (3) gripped by clamps (1h) at the end of a jointed linkage (1c,1e) whose inner end is attached to the support pillar (2) via a joint (1b). The whole linkage allows displacement of the cable in a vertical plane and braces against lateral displacement. The vertical displacement is associated with displacements along the cable track.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/02; B61B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/02 (2006.01); B61B 12/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2013.01); B61B 12/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970864 A2 20000112; EP 0970864 A3 20000906; EP 0970864 B1 20031203; AT 255515 T 20031215

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROPETRANS AG

2003-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BEARING DEVICE FOR A SUPPORT CABLE

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI