Global patent index - EP 0970865 A2

EP 0970865 A2 2000-01-12 - Window for vehicles, especially for railway vehicles

Title (en)

Window for vehicles, especially for railway vehicles

Title (de)

Fenster für Fahrzeuge, insbesondere für Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Fenêtre pour véhicules, notamment pour véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 0970865 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112214 A

Priority

DE 19830114 A

Abstract (en)

A safety window for a train has a single pane (1) of safety glass which shatters when struck by an emergency hammer. The pane is held in the window frame by adhesive (30 and by an internal clip frame (5). A plastic foil (4) is bonded to the inside surface of the glass to prevent scattering of glass splinters when the pane is smashed. The plastic foil reaches only to the lip of the inner clip frame. This ensures that when the pane is smashed the foil holds together the central section and enables it to be pushed out of the frame, leaving the edge splinters held by the adhesive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Fenster für Fahrzeuge, insbesondere für Schienenfahrzeuge mit einer in einem Fensterrahmen (2) geklebten Fensterscheibe ( 1), die von innen durch ein Klemmprofil (5) eingefaßt ist. Damit auch bei der Verwendung von im Fensterrahmen (2) geklebten Fensterscheiben (1), insbesondere aus Einscheiben-Sicherheitsglas (ESG) die Fensteröffnung als Notausstiegsöffnung geeignet ist, ist auf der zum Fahrzeuginneren gewandten Seite der Fensterscheibe (1) eine Folie (4) aufgeklebt, die kleiner als die Scheibenfläche der Fensterscheibe (1) ausgeführt ist, derart, daß der äußere Rand der Folie (4) flächenmäßig bis etwa zur Kante der durch den Fensterrahmen (2) begrenzten Öffnung erstreckt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 25/00; B61D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/02 (2006.01); B61D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/026 (2013.01); B61D 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2146788 A1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970865 A2 20000112; EP 0970865 A3 20000301; EP 0970865 B1 20011121; AT 209129 T 20011215; DE 19830114 A1 20000113; DK 0970865 T3 20020521; ES 2165215 T3 20020301; PT 970865 E 20020531

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-02-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2165215

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59900669

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020221

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 209129

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI