Global patent index - EP 0970870 A2

EP 0970870 A2 2000-01-12 - Apparatus for monitoring trackbound vehicles comprising a traction unit and at least one wagon

Title (en)

Apparatus for monitoring trackbound vehicles comprising a traction unit and at least one wagon

Title (de)

Einrichtung für die Überwachung eines schienengebundenen Zuges aus einem Triebfahrzeug und mindestens einem Waggon

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la surveillance de véhicules sur rails comprenant une unité motrice et au moins un wagon

Publication

EP 0970870 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99108025 A

Priority

DE 19830053 A

Abstract (en)

The train monitoring device uses a communication device (3a,3b) linked to the onboard computer for the locomotive (1) and each wagon (2) of the train, for communication with at least one monitoring center (5) via a long distance communication link (4). The communication devices communicate with one another via a short distance communication link (6), with polling of the data provided by each wagon communication device, which is normally held in a sleep mode.

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung für die Überwachung eines schienengebundenen Zuges aus einem Triebfahrzeug und mindestens einem Waggon, wobei das Triebfahrzeug und die Waggons jeweils eine Kommunikationsausrüstung mit Bordcomputer und mit einer Langstreckenkommunikationsanbindung an eine Zentrale mit Energieversorgung aufweisen. Die Kommunikationsausrüstungen der Waggons besitzen außerdem mindestens einen den Fahrzeugbetrieb überwachenden Sensor. Erfindungsgemäß weist die Kommunikationsausrüstung des Triebfahrzeuges eine Führungs-Sende/Empfangseinheit für ein Kurzstreckenkommunikationsmedium auf, welche im Polling-Betrieb ständig elektromagnetische Wellen zur Datenkommunikation mit den Kommunikationsausrüstungen der Waggons aussendet. Die Waggon-Kommunikationsausrüstungen weisen Sende/Empfangseinheiten für die Kurzstreckenkommunikation auf, die in einen Sleep-Modus versetzbar sind und im Polling-Betrieb Datensätze zur Identifizierung des Waggons abgeben. Die Sende/Empfangseinheiten der in die Waggons eingebauten Kommunikationsausrüstungen werden bei Eintritt eines von dem Sensor erfaßten Betriebszustandes automatisch aktiviert und geben ein Signal ab, welches von der Kommunikationsausrüstung des Triebfahrzeuges empfangen und angezeigt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/00 (2006.01); B61L 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/0027 (2013.01); B61L 15/0072 (2013.01); B61L 15/0081 (2013.01); B61L 25/04 (2013.01); B61L 27/0077 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0748084 A1
  • [Y] EP 0748080 A1
  • [Y] US 3994459 A
  • [Y] DE 3621990 A1
  • [AD] DE 4408261 A1
  • [A] US 5442553 A
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 565 (M-1694), 28. Oktober 1994 (1994-10-28) & JP 06 205501 A (OKUMURA CORP), 22. Juli 1994 (1994-07-22)
  • [A] SCHULTES G: "BUSSYSTEME DES INTERCITYEXPRESS*). \THE BUS SYSTEMS OF THE INTERCITYEXPRESS" ZEITSCHRIFT FUR EISENBAHNWESEN UND VERKEHRSTECHNIK. DIE EISENBAHNTECHNIK + GLASERS ANNALEN, GEORG SIEMENS VERLAGSBUCHHANDLUNG. BERLIN, DE, Bd. 116, Nr. 11 / 12, 1. November 1992 (1992-11-01), Seiten 438-442, XP000332327 ISSN: 0941-0589

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • EP 0748084 A1
  • DE 4408261 A1
  • US 5442553 A
  • SCHULTES G.: 'Bussysteme de Inter City Express' ZEV + DET GLAS Bd. 116, Nr. 11, 12 November 1992, Seiten 438 - 442, XP000889551
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Bd. 018, Nr. 565 (M-1694) 28 Oktober 1992 & JP 06 205 501 A (ITO TOYOO) 22 Juli 1994

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830053 C1 19991118; AT 426538 T 20090415; DE 59914988 D1 20090507; EP 0970870 A2 20000112; EP 0970870 A3 20020828; EP 0970870 B1 20090325

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140423

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGRI NL] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Effective date: 20100712

2012-04-18 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: S28

- Free Format Text: RESTORATION ALLOWED

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110423

2012-02-08 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: S28

- Free Format Text: APPLICATION FILED

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110423

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090325

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090423

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090325

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-10-29 [PGRI NL] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Effective date: 20100712

2010-10-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090423

2010-07-14 [REG NL RD2A] PATENTS IN RESPECT OF WHICH A DECISION HAS BEEN TAKEN OR A REPORT HAS BEEN MADE (FOR ADVICE)

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RD2A

- Effective date: 20100712

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGRI CH] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 20100113

2010-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091229

2010-02-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free Format Text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE (ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995) HAS BEEN FILED ON20091029

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 12.01.2010 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HAUCH, WERNER

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090706

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-10-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2009-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-05-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59914988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20090507

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-04-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2009-03-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUCH, WERNER

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TIMTEC TELDATRANS GMBH

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VTG AG

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Extension state: AL

- Payment date: 20030228

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Extension state: LT

- Payment date: 20030228

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Extension state: LV

- Payment date: 20030228

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Extension state: MK

- Payment date: 20030228

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Extension state: RO

- Payment date: 20030215

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Extension state: SI

- Payment date: 20030228

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TIMTEC TELDATRANS GMBH

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VTG-LEHNKERING AG

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVA EISENBAHN-VERKEHRSMITTEL-GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TIMTEC TELDATRANS GMBH

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 61L 27/00 A, 7B 61L 15/00 B, 7B 61L 25/04 B, 7B 61L 23/04 B

2002-03-20 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: EVA EISENBAHN-VERKEHRSMITTEL-GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2002-03-20 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: TIMTEC TELEMATIK GMBH

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVA EISENBAHN-VERKEHRSMITTEL-GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRUPP TIMTEC TELEMATIK GMBH

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI