Global Patent Index - EP 0970895 A1

EP 0970895 A1 2000-01-12 - Assembly of a frozen cake and a disposable tray, and method for defrosting a frozen cake

Title (en)

Assembly of a frozen cake and a disposable tray, and method for defrosting a frozen cake

Title (de)

Kuchen und Schalenanordnung und Verfahren zum Abtauen von gefrorenem Kuchen

Title (fr)

Ensemble de gateau congelé et barquette, et méthode pour décongeler le gateau

Publication

EP 0970895 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202198 A

Priority

NL 1009571 A

Abstract (en)

Assembly (1) of a frozen cake (2) and a disposable tray (3) at least partly made of aluminum. The disposable tray comprises a bottom (4) and a circumferential rim (8) extending upright with respect to the bottom. At least a part (9) of the bottom of the disposable tray can be detached, such that an aluminum ring is left, having an upright rim and an inwardly reaching flange extending along the circumference thereof. The aluminum ring (12) can be applied to the top of the frozen cake, such that the side and the more outward portion op the top surface of the frozen cake can at least partly be shielded against microwave radiation during defrosting. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3453 (2013.01); B65D 85/36 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3405 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3435 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3489 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970895 A1 20000112; NL 1009571 C2 20000110

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030402

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI