Global Patent Index - EP 0970903 A2

EP 0970903 A2 2000-01-12 - Paper feed device for printing press

Title (en)

Paper feed device for printing press

Title (de)

Papierzuführvorrichtung für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en papier pour une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0970903 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99112961 A

Priority

JP 19177798 A

Abstract (en)

A paper feed device for a printing press which can laterally register a stack of paper sheets. A positioning guide is provided opposite one side of the upper portion of a stack of paper sheets placed on an elevator table. A jogger is provided opposite the other side of the upper portion of the stack of paper sheets. The jogger is reciprocated by a reciprocator to press the upper portion of the stack against the positioning guide, thereby laterally registering the stacked sheets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10; B65H 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/14 (2006.01); B65H 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 9/10 (2006.01); B65H 31/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/04 (2013.01); B65H 31/38 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4222 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970903 A2 20000112; EP 0970903 A3 20001213; JP 2000016599 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI