Global patent index - EP 0970903 A3

EP 0970903 A3 2000-12-13 - Paper feed device for printing press

Title (en)

Paper feed device for printing press

Title (de)

Papierzuführvorrichtung für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en papier pour une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0970903 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99112961 A

Priority

JP 19177798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0970903A2] A paper feed device for a printing press which can laterally register a stack of paper sheets. A positioning guide is provided opposite one side of the upper portion of a stack of paper sheets placed on an elevator table. A jogger is provided opposite the other side of the upper portion of the stack of paper sheets. The jogger is reciprocated by a reciprocator to press the upper portion of the stack against the positioning guide, thereby laterally registering the stacked sheets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10; B65H 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/14 (2006.01); B65H 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 9/10 (2006.01); B65H 31/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/04 (2013.01); B65H 31/38 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4222 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970903 A2 20000112; EP 0970903 A3 20001213; JP 2000016599 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI