Global patent index - EP 0970906 A2

EP 0970906 A2 2000-01-12 - Transport system

Title (en)

Transport system

Title (de)

Fördersystem

Title (fr)

Système de transport

Publication

EP 0970906 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112964 A

Priority

DE 19831062 A

Abstract (en)

The shunt has a stationary base frame (12) and a movable swivel element (14) for setting different distributor positions. At least one first carrier belt (30) replaces one pressure belt (18) near the shunt (10). A deflector roller (32) of the first carrier belt is fixed to the base frame, and a further deflector roller (34) of the first carrier belt is fixed to the swivel element. Deflector rollers for further carrier belts (40,50,60) are fixed to the swivel element. A tension roller (38) is fixed to the equalizing element (39).

Abstract (de)

Ein Fördersystem zum Fördern eines Produktstromes von in Schuppenformation angeordneten- Produkten weist ein ankommendes Preßbandpaar (18, 20) und zumindest zwei abgehende Preßbandpaare (88, 90, 88', 90) auf. Zwischen dem ankommenden Preßbandpaar (A) und dem abgehenden Preßbandpaar (C) ist eine Weiche (10) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/58; B65H 29/12; B65H 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/58 (2013.01); B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4474 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2615 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 3406055 A1
  • [X] US 5467976 A
  • [A] DE 19630762 A1
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 002 (M-1348), 5. Januar 1993 (1993-01-05) & JP 04 235855 A (KOUFU NIHON DENKI KK), 24. August 1992 (1992-08-24)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 187 (M-401), 3. August 1985 (1985-08-03) & JP 60 052460 A (NICHIRO KOGYO KK), 25. März 1985 (1985-03-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970906 A2 20000112; EP 0970906 A3 20000830; EP 0970906 B1 20040324; AT 262469 T 20040415; DE 19831062 A1 20000113; JP 2000063024 A 20000229; US 6349937 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GAMMERLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GAMMERLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-09-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-06-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59908931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040429

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-03-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI