Global Patent Index - EP 0970910 A1

EP 0970910 A1 2000-01-12 - Textile machine producing cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Textile machine producing cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine textile pour la fabrication de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 0970910 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107126 A

Priority

DE 19830101 A

Abstract (en)

In the working position (III) yarn (30) is wound from a feed bobbin (4) into a cross-wound package (11). At each winding machine position a horizontal conveyor (5) and a vertical lift (6) provide two further locations (I,IV), for loading full bobbins, and to act as intermediate location respectively. A new bobbin (4) is loaded in the raised position (I) while the empty tube is removed from the working position (III) and parked in an intermediate position (IV). The new bobbin is lowered and brought to the working position (III). The empty tube (26) is brought to the vertical lift (6) and raised to the loading position (I) to be exchanged for a full bobbin.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine (1) zum Umspulen großvolumiger Ablaufspulen (4), mit einer Handhabungs- und Transporteinrichtung (3). Mittels dieser Handhabungs- und Transporteinrichtung (3). können auf einfache Weise Ablaufspulen (4) aus einer Aufsteckposition (I) in eine Spulposition (III) überführt werden. Erfindungsgemäß weist jede Arbeitsstelle (2) der Textilmaschine (1) eine Handhabungs- und Transporteinrichtung (3) mit einer horizontal angeordneten Transporteinheit (5) und einer im wesentlichen vertikal verlaufenden Transporteinheit (6) auf. Auf den Transporteinheiten (5, 6) sind Transportelemente (9', 9''), die jeweils ein großvolumige Ablaufspule (4, 4', etc.) aufnehmen können, definiert verschiebbar gelagert. Die Transportelemente (9', 9'') können dabei leicht von der einen Transporteinheit (5) auf die andere Transporteinheit (6) und umgekehrt überführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 67/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/02 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2118443 C2 19820819

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970910 A1 20000112; EP 0970910 B1 20011212; DE 19830101 A1 20000113; JP 2000026025 A 20000125; US 6283400 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070413

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070604

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: W. *SCHLAFHORST & CO.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-05-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030505

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030418

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900526 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2001-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI