Global Patent Index - EP 0970914 A2

EP 0970914 A2 2000-01-12 - Mobile crane with telescopic jib

Title (en)

Mobile crane with telescopic jib

Title (de)

Fahrbarer Kran mit einem Teleskopausleger

Title (fr)

Grue mobile avec flèche télescopique

Publication

EP 0970914 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250223 A

Priority

  • DE 19932009 A
  • DE 19831431 A

Abstract (en)

A telescopic arrangement on a base casing (13) has retractable and insertable telescope lengths (14-18) at least one of which swivels towards the tiltable jib-arm (12) by means of a bend point (19) possessing an adjusting mechanism and closed and opened by a hinge. The innermost telescopic section (18) at least can be swiveled and adjoins at least one non-bent section (14). The hinge of the bend point is on the underside of the jib-arm, and the adjusting mechanism is on the top of the jib-arm.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen fahrbaren Kran (1) mit einem Teleskopausleger (12), bestehend aus einem Grundkasten (13) und mehreren mittels einer Teleskopiereinrichtung aus- und einfahrbaren Teleskopschüssen (14-18), wobei mindestens ein Teleskopschuß in Richtung des neigbaren Auslegers (12) durch eine schließ- und öffnenbare mit einem Scharnier (26) und einem Verstellmechanismus versehene Abknickstelle (19) verschwenkbar ist. Dabei ist mindestens der innerste Schuß (18) verschwenkbar und rückwärtig daran schließt sich wenigstens ein nicht abgeknickter Teleskopschuß (14) an. Das Scharnier (26) der Abknickstelle (19) ist auf der Unterseite und der Verstellmechanismus ist auf der Oberseite des Auslegers angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/702 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

"Demag Fördertechnik, Demag Ac 1600", PROSPEKT MANNESMANN, 24 April 1996 (1996-04-24), pages 5,17,23,24,27,28 & DE 3934783 A1 19900426 - SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0970914 A2 20000112; EP 0970914 A3 20030212; EP 0970914 B1 20090318

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TEREX GLOBAL GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TEREX DEMAG GMBH, 66482 ZWEIBRUECKEN, DE

- Document: DE 59914981

2016-11-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914981

- Representative's name: MOSER GOETZE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914981

- Representative's name: MOSER GOETZE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TEREX DEMAG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090705

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090705

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090705

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091221

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914981 P 20090430

2009-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2009-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2009-03-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEREX DEMAG GMBH

2008-06-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEREX-DEMAG GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REIFENSCHEID, CHRISTIAN

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOWASSER, WALTER

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REIFENSCHEID,CHRISTIAN

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOWASSER, WALTER

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI