Global Patent Index - EP 0971017 A2

EP 0971017 A2 2000-01-12 - Process and apparatus for gasifying a solid fuel in lump form

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for gasifying a solid fuel in lump form

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vergasung eines in stückiger Form vorliegenden festen Brennstoffs

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la gazéification d'un combustible solide sous forme de morceaux

Publication

EP 0971017 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112863 A

Priority

DE 19830765 A

Abstract (en)

The low calorific gas arising from carbonization is heated in a cracker reactor (II) to T2 such that long chain and/or (poly)cyclic hydrocarbon compounds are thermally-cracked. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding gasification plant. Preferred Features: Heating is indirect and no oxidant is supplied. The char is oxidized in a combustion reactor, releasing energy to heat the fuel. Water is supplied to the gasifier. T2 is 600 degrees C or more, preferably 800 degrees C-1000 degrees C. Fuel in the gasifier is heated by a heat exchanger surface. Fuel is oxidized in a separate reactor from the gasifier. The cracker is inside the combustor, which is inside the gasifier reactor. The cracker has the form of a tubular spiral. Gasifier and combustor form a unit, with the fuel moving under gravity. Gas leaving the combustor rises into the adjacent cracker which shares a common wall with the combustor, near a combustion zone. The combustor has a conveying unit below, taking fuel in to the side, beneath the cracker. Heat exchanger surfaces in the cracker are provided with catalytic substances.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Vergasung eines in stückiger Form vorliegenden festen Brennstoffs zu einem brennbaren Schwachgas wird der Brennstoff in einem Entgasungsreaktor auf eine solche Temperatur T1 erhitzt, daß eine mit seiner Pyrolyse einhergehende Vergasung erfolgt. Um ein von teerartigen Substanzen freies Schwachgas zu erhalten, das ohne weitere Reinigungsschritte einem Verbrennungsmotor zuführbar ist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß das entstehende Schwachgas in einem Nachbehandlungsreaktor auf eine solche Temperatur T2 erhitzt wird, daß in dem Schwachgas enthaltene langkettige und/oder (poly)zyklische Kohlenwasserstoffverbindungen thermisch aufgespalten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/64 (2013.01); C10K 3/008 (2013.01); C10J 2300/092 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0973 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971017 A2 20000112; EP 0971017 A3 20000315; DE 19830765 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 10J 3/64 A, 7C 10B 53/00 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI