Global Patent Index - EP 0971019 A1

EP 0971019 A1 2000-01-12 - Method of cleaning dishes

Title (en)

Method of cleaning dishes

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung von Geschirr

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le nettoyage de la vaisselle

Publication

EP 0971019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114776 A

Priority

DE 19824356 A

Abstract (en)

A combination of: (i) an amphoteric surfactant; and (ii) an oxidizing agent which contains active oxygen is used in a cleaning solution for cleaning crockery without leaving a smell associated with the washing process. Cleaning of crockery comprises: (a) treating the crockery with a cleaning solution which contains an amphoteric surfactant and an oxidizing agent which contains active oxygen; (b) rinsing the crockery; and (c) drying the crockery. Independent claims are included for: (A) A cleaning agent for preparation of a cleaning solution for use in a process as described above, comprising: (a) 0.5-80 (especially 5-20) wt.% of an amphoteric surfactant; (b) an oxidizing agent which contains 0.1-10 (especially 0.5-5) wt.% of active oxygen; and (c) other active agents and auxiliaries. (B) A cleaning agent for preparation of a cleaning solution for use in a process as described above, comprising: (a) a liquid agent which contains an amphoteric surfactant and optionally other active agents and auxiliaries; and (b) a second liquid agent which contains hydrogen peroxide and optionally other active agents and auxiliaries.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/90; C11D 1/10; C11D 3/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/90 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01); C11D 11/0035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824356 A1 19991202; AT 199388 T 20010315; DK 0971019 T3 20010605; EP 0971019 A1 20000112; EP 0971019 B1 20010228; ES 2156015 T3 20010601; GR 3035529 T3 20010629; PT 971019 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-31 [REG PT MF4A] REVOCATION OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-09-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-08-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020822

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

2002-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020715

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-06-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CHEMISCHE FABRIK DR. WEIGERT (GMBH & CO.)

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CHEMISCHE FABRIK DR. WEIGERT (GMBH & CO.)

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010810

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010807

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156015 T3

2001-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800499 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199388 T 20010315

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980806

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI