Global patent index - EP 0971020 A1

EP 0971020 A1 2000-01-12 - Non-foaming detergent compositions for concentrated alkaline medium

Title (en)

Non-foaming detergent compositions for concentrated alkaline medium

Title (de)

Nichtschäumende Reinigungsmittel für konzentriertes alkalisches Medium

Title (fr)

Compositions détergentes non moussantes pour milieux alcalins concentrés

Publication

EP 0971020 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401539 A

Priority

FR 9808608 A

Abstract (en)

A detergent composition non-foaming and stable in a strongly alkaline medium, for industrial or domestic uses comprises a non-foaming detergent (25-45 wt. parts), a stabilizing agent (15-25 wt. parts) and alkenylsuccinic acid or anhydride (30-60 wt. parts). A detergent composition non-foaming and stable in a strongly alkaline medium, for industrial or domestic uses comprises a non-foaming detergent of formula (I) (25-45 wt. parts), a stabilizing agent (15-25 wt. parts) and alkenylsuccinic acid of formula (II) or its anhydride (30-60 wt. parts). The stabilizing agent is phosphoric mono- or diester produced by reacting phosphoric anhydride with 4-12C aliphatic alcohol. R<1> = 8-20C (preferably 8-12C) alkyl, octylphenyl or nonylphenyl; n = 8-15; R<2> = 3-5C alkoxy, benzyloxy, Cl or polyoxyalkylene of formula (i); R' = 1-2C alkyl; p = 1-10; m = 4-12. An Independent claim is also included for a detergent comprising the detergent composition described above (1-5 wt. %) in a solution of sodium hydroxide or potassium hydroxide, or a mixture of alkaline salts.

Abstract (fr)

Compositions détergentes non moussantes et stables en milieu fortement alcalin, comportant 25 à 45 % en poids d'agent détergent non moussant, en particulier un tensioactif non ionique chapeauté, par exemple un -alkyle--halogéno-poly(oxy-1,2-éthanediyle), ou un l'-décyl--benzyloxy-poly(oxy-1,2-éthanediyle), 15 à 25 % en poids d'agent de stabilisation, en particulier un ester phosphorique d'alcool gras, et 30 à 60 % en poids d'acide ou d'anhydride alkénylsuccinique, en particulier l'acide ou l'anhydride octénylsuccinique. Ces compositions permettent la préparation de lessives alcalines pour nettoyage de surfaces dures, elles-mêmes non moussantes, même en nettoyage sous pression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 3/362 (2013.01); C11D 1/08 (2013.01); C11D 1/345 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971020 A1 20000112; EP 0971020 B1 20040310; AR 019888 A1 20020320; AT 261488 T 20040315; BR 9902540 A 20000118; CA 2276906 A1 20000106; CA 2276906 C 20030923; DE 69915414 D1 20040415; DE 69915414 T2 20050303; FR 2780732 A1 20000107; FR 2780732 B1 20000908; JP 2000178582 A 20000627; NO 993319 A 20000107; NO 993319 D0 19990705; US 2003078175 A1 20030424; US 6693065 B2 20040217

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110101

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090603

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *CECA

- Effective date: 20050630

2007-12-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-09-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-08-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-06-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-06-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040616

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-06-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-06-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-06-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69915414

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040415

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2004-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI