Global Patent Index - EP 0971026 A1

EP 0971026 A1 2000-01-12 - Laundry and cleaning compositions

Title (en)

Laundry and cleaning compositions

Title (de)

Wasch- und Reiningungsmittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de lavage et de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0971026 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870025 A

Priority

  • EP 99870025 A
  • EP 98870155 A
  • EP 98870226 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a laundry and cleaning composition comprising a detersive ingredient and a product of reaction between an amino functional polymer comprising at least one primary amine group, and a perfume component. By the present invention, there is obtained a release of the active component over a longer period of time than by the use of the active itself.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/50; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/30; C11D 3/33; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/04 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/507 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0831143 A1 19980325 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]
  • [A] EP 0841391 A1 19980513 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]
  • [A] US H1468 H 19950801 - COSTA JILL B [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0011499 A1 19800528 - UNILEVER LTD [GB], et al
  • [A] EP 0430315 A2 19910605 - UNILEVER NV [NL], et al
  • [A] KAMOGAWA H ET AL: "Chemical release control- Schiff bases of perfume aldehydes and aminostyrenes", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, vol. 20, 1 January 1982 (1982-01-01), pages 3121 - 3129, XP002084908, ISSN: 0887-624X
  • [A] VIGUERA A -R ET AL: "A WATER-SOLUBLE POLYLYSINE-RETINALDEHYDE SCHIFF BASE. STABILITY IN AQUEOUS AND NANOQUEOUS ENVIRONMENTS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 265, no. 5, 15 February 1990 (1990-02-15), pages 2527 - 2532, XP002057413, ISSN: 0021-9258

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971026 A1 20000112; AT 339494 T 20061015; AU 4870299 A 20000201; BR 9912033 A 20010522; CA 2336666 A1 20000120; CN 1321187 A 20011107; CZ 20010058 A3 20020417; DE 69933230 D1 20061026; DE 69933230 T2 20070830; DE 69933230 T3 20130207; EP 1123376 A2 20010816; EP 1123376 B1 20060913; EP 1123376 B2 20121017; ES 2273504 T3 20070501; HU 0200238 A2 20020729; HU 0200238 A3 20040128; ID 28314 A 20010510; JP 2002520495 A 20020709; JP 4493849 B2 20100630; MA 24922 A1 20000401; TR 200100002 T2 20020923; WO 0002982 A2 20000120; WO 0002982 A3 20010614

INPADOC legal status


2000-08-16 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-08-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000615

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI