Global patent index - EP 0971028 A1

EP 0971028 A1 2000-01-12 - Detergent tablet with high dissolution and mechanical characteristics

Title (en)

Detergent tablet with high dissolution and mechanical characteristics

Title (de)

Waschmitteltablette mit hoher Löslichkeit und verbesserten mechanischen Eigenschaften

Title (fr)

Comprimé détergent à caractéristiques de dissolution et mécaniques améliorées

Publication

EP 0971028 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98870152 A

Priority

EP 98870152 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a tablet formed by compressing a particulate material, the particulate material comprising a surfactant and a hydrotrope compound, the hydrotrope compound having a cohesive effect on the particulate material. In a further aspect of the invention there is provided a tablet for preparing an aqueous solution of a laundry detergent having a tensile strength of at least 15 kPa, the tablet giving less than 40% per weight residue in the dispenser at the end of the water supply cycle under dispensing test, the dispensing test consisting of two tablets, each tablet weighing 50g, being placed in the dispenser of a Baucknecht TM WA9850 washing machine, the water supply to the washing machine being set at a temperature of 20 DEG C and a hardness of 21 grains per gallon, the dispenser water inlet flow rate being set to 8 l/min, the machine being set to program 4 (white/colors, short cycle) and switched on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3746 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01); C11D 3/2075 (2013.01); C11D 3/3418 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971028 A1 20000112; AR 019760 A1 20020313; MA 24923 A1 20000401

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031127

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI