Global patent index - EP 0971030 A1

EP 0971030 A1 2000-01-12 - Surfactant agglomerates

Title (en)

Surfactant agglomerates

Title (de)

Tensidagglomerate

Title (fr)

Agglomérats tensio-actifs

Publication

EP 0971030 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870091 A

Priority

  • EP 99870091 A
  • EP 98870154 A

Abstract (en)

A high active surfactant agglomerate is disclosed which has a reduced tendency to gel upon contact with water, and has an improved dissolution profile in water. The surfactant agglomerate comprises a surfactant and a carrier and a water-soluble cationic compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 17/0034 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9813453 A1
  • [X] EP 0714976 A1
  • [A] GB 1557568 A
  • [A] US 4756849 A
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 8907 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A97, AN 89-051377 XP002088286 & JP 64 001797 A (LION CORP), 6 January 1989 (1989-01-06)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 8828 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A97, AN 88-193748 XP002088287 & JP 63 130700 A (LION CORP), 2 June 1988 (1988-06-02)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 8848 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D25, AN 88-341959 XP002088288 & JP 63 254199 A (LION CORP), 20 October 1988 (1988-10-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971030 A1 20000112; AU 4984499 A 20000201; BR 9912636 A 20010502; CA 2336983 A1 20000120; CN 1308668 A 20010815; JP 2002520447 A 20020709; MA 24926 A1 20000401; WO 0002995 A1 20000120; WO 0002995 A9 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040320

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI