Global Patent Index - EP 0971044 A1

EP 0971044 A1 2000-01-12 - Clad hot-rolled and cold-rolled steel sheet, presenting a very high resistance after thermal treatment

Title (en)

Clad hot-rolled and cold-rolled steel sheet, presenting a very high resistance after thermal treatment

Title (de)

Beschichtetes warmgewalztes und kaltgewalztes Stahlblech mit sehr hoher Festigkeit nach thermischer Behandlung

Title (fr)

Tole d'acier laminée à chaud et à froid revêtue et présentant une très haute résistance après traitement thermique

Publication

EP 0971044 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401690 A

Priority

FR 9808793 A

Abstract (en)

A hot rolled steel sheet, consisting of a hot dip aluminized, shaped and heat treated sheet of low alloy steel of specified composition, is new. A novel hot rolled steel sheet consists of a steel of composition (by wt.) 0.15-0.5% (exclusive) C, 0.5-3% (exclusive) Mn, 0.1-0.5% (exclusive) Si, 0.01-1% (exclusive) Cr, less than 0.2% Ti, less than 0.1% Al, less than 0.1% P, less than 0.05% S, 0.0005-0.08% (exclusive) B, balance Fe and impurities. An Independent claim is also included for forming a part from the above steel sheet having a hot dip aluminized coating which is heated at more than 5 to 600 degrees C/s. or more after sheet forming and before heat treatment. Preferred Features: The sheet is hot dip coated in a bath of composition 2-3.5% Fe and balance Al, optionally with addition of 9-10% Si.

Abstract (fr)

Tôle d'acier laminée à chaud et pouvant être ensuite laminée à froid, revêtue, l'acier de la tôle ayant la composition pondérale suivante : 0,15% < carbone < 0,5% 0,5% < manganèse < 3% 0,1% < silicium < 0,5% 0,01% < chrome < 1%, titane < 0,2%, aluminium < 0,1%, phosphore < 0,1%, soufre < 0,05%, 0,0005% < bore < 0,08%, le solde étant du fer et des impuretés inhérentes à l'élaboration, la tôle assurant une très haute résistance mécanique après traitement thermique et le revêtement à base d'aluminium assurant une haute tenue à la corrosion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/12 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/32 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01); C23C 2/28 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/32 (2013.01); C21D 8/0278 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01); Y10S 428/939 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12757 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5178688 A 19930112 - YU IN-SEOK [KR], et al
  • [Y] FR 2625227 A1 19890630 - INTRAVISS SN [FR]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 017 (C - 796) 14 January 1991 (1991-01-14)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 457 (C - 644) 16 October 1989 (1989-10-16)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 523 (C - 1256) 4 October 1994 (1994-10-04)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 004 (C - 1149) 6 January 1994 (1994-01-06)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971044 A1 20000112; EP 0971044 B1 20030514; AT 240419 T 20030515; BR 9902712 A 20000308; CA 2276911 A1 20000109; CA 2276911 C 20090505; DE 69907816 D1 20030618; DE 69907816 T2 20040311; DK 0971044 T3 20030811; ES 2196740 T3 20031216; FR 2780984 A1 20000114; FR 2780984 B1 20010622; JP 2000038640 A 20000208; JP 3931251 B2 20070613; PT 971044 E 20030829; US 6296805 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE, FR

- Document: AT 240419 T

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-04-30 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140418

2014-04-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ACELORMITTAL FRANCE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-03-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE, FR

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-02-28 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: IMMEUBLE "LE CEZANNE" RUE ANDRE CAMPRA 6,F-93200

- Effective date: 20140206

2014-02-28 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE

- Effective date: 20140206

2014-02-28 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE

- Effective date: 20140206

2014-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: USINOR, FR

2014-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ARCELOR FRANCE, FR

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: USINOR, PUTEAUX, FR

- Document: DE 69907816

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69907816

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20131202

2013-12-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69907816

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2006-09-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2006-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: USINOR

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: USINOR

- Free text: SOLLAC#IMMEUBLE "LA PACIFIC", 11/13 COURS VALMY, LA DEFENSE 7#92800 PUTEAUX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- USINOR#LA DEFENSE 7 IMMEUBLE "LA PACIFIC" 11/13 COURS VALMY#92800 PUTEAUX (FR)

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196740 T3

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402965

2003-08-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-08-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907816 P 20030618

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAURENT, JEAN-PIERRE

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEVROC, JACQUES

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HENNECHART, JEAN-PAUL

2000-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPEHNER, DOMINIQUE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI