Global patent index - EP 0971056 A1

EP 0971056 A1 2000-01-12 - Process and apparatus for steam transport through at least one round spinnerets shaft

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for steam transport through at least one round spinnerets shaft

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Transport von Dampf durch mindestens einen runden Spinndüsenschacht

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le transport de vapeur à travers au moins un conduit circulaire pour filières

Publication

EP 0971056 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107372 A

Priority

DE 19830453 A

Abstract (en)

To carry steam through at least one circular melt spinning shaft (5), with a lower circular spinneret plate (10) and a suction unit (14,15), the steam is fed at a tangent into the upper section of the shaft (5). It passes through at least one spiral groove (7) round the exterior of the spinneret unit (6) and led downwards. At the bottom of the spinneret unit (6), the steam is directed against a circular and horizontal groove (8) to alter its flow direction to the spinneret plate (10). The steam is finally taken over the inner edge (9) of the groove (8) to the spinneret plate (10) through an initial ring gap (11). At the spinneret plate (10), it is extracted by the suction system (14,15) through a second ring gap (12). At least one spiral groove (7) takes the steam at the exterior of the spinneret unit (6), in a trapezoid winding. After moving over the inner edge (9), it is directed to the spinneret plate (10) through a ring surface pitched at an inwards angle. The flow direction of the steam can set by a guide plate at the suction unit (14). An Independent claim is included for an appts. where the suction system (15) is in a release fitting at the spinning head.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Transport von Dampf durch mindestens einen runden Spinndüsenschacht (5) mit unter der mindestens einen runden Spinndüsenplatte (10) angeordneter Absaugvorrichtung (14, 15) zum Verspinnen von PA 6 oder PA 6.6. Bei dem Verfahren ist vorgesehen, daß der Dampf tangential in den oberen Teil des jeweiligen Spinndüsenschachtes (5) eingebracht und durch mindestens eine schraubenförmig verlaufende Nut (7), die außen um die jeweilige Spinndüseneinheit (6) angeordnet ist, nach unten geleitet wird. Der Dampf wird am unteren Ende der Spinndüseneinheit (6) gegen eine kreisförmige horizontal angeordnete Nut (8) geleitet und erfährt dort eine Änderung der Strömungsrichtung zur Spinndüsenplatte (10) hin. Der Dampf wird anschließend über die innere Kante (9) der kreisförmigen horizontal angeordneten Nut (8) über einen ersten Ringspalt (11) zur Spinndüsenplatte (10) geleitet und an der Spinndüsenplatte (10) über einen zweiten Ringspalt (12) durch die Absaugvorrichtung (14, 15) abgesaugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971056 A1 20000112; DE 19830453 A1 20000113; US 6146566 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050331

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIMMER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI