Global Patent Index - EP 0971058 A1

EP 0971058 A1 2000-01-12 - Suction system of a textile machine

Title (en)

Suction system of a textile machine

Title (de)

Saugluftanlage einer Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'aspiration d'une machine textile

Publication

EP 0971058 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107226 A

Priority

DE 19830394 A

Abstract (en)

The spark detector (22) has an optical sensor (28) to provide an alarm signal or initiate fire fighting actions when glowing fibers or sparks are detected in the suction duct. It also has a controlled source (40) of electromagnetic waves that can trigger the sensor (28) in order to regularly test the proper functioning of the detector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Saugluftanlage einer Textilmaschine, insbesondere einer Rotorspinnmaschine, mit wenigstens einem Saugluftkanal und mit wenigstens einem Funkensensor zur Detektion eines Funkenfluges innerhalb einer Meßstrecke der Saugluftanlage, der eine Meßeinrichtung umfaßt, deren Sensierbereich zumindest teilweise die Meßstrecke überschneidet, und die wenigstens einen Empfänger elektromagnetischer Wellen aufweist, der bei Eintritt eines Funkens in den Sensierbereich ein Ausgangssignal generiert, und einer Ansteuer- und Auswerteschaltung für den Funkensensor. Es ist vorgesehen, daß dem optischen Empfänger (28) wenigstens eine Quelle (40) zum Generieren elektromagnetischer Wellen zugeordnet ist, und die wenigstens eine Quelle (40) derart ansteuerbar ist, daß ein gezieltes Auslösen des Funkensensors (22) erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/36; D01H 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/36 (2006.01); D01H 11/00 (2006.01); D01H 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/14 (2013.01); D01H 4/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2426961 B2 19791025

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971058 A1 20000112; EP 0971058 B1 20030205; CN 1210450 C 20050713; CN 1240843 A 20000112; DE 19830394 A1 20000113; JP 2000064134 A 20000229; US 6317645 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ARGUS FIRE CONTROL, INC.

- Effective date: 20031105

2005-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040511

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ARGUS FIRE CONTROL, INC.

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-04-23 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: WEUTHAN, STEPHAN

2003-04-23 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: KAMPS, KARL

2003-04-23 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: JANSEN, GERD

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904205 P 20030313

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI