Global Patent Index - EP 0971060 A1

EP 0971060 A1 2000-01-12 - Method for making pile loops on a web by knitting, pile loop fabric made according to his method, and its application

Title (en)

Method for making pile loops on a web by knitting, pile loop fabric made according to his method, and its application

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polschlingen auf einer Warenbahn, nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Polschlingenware und deren Anwendung

Title (fr)

Procédé de formation par tricotage de boucles sur une feuille, tissu à boucles réalisé selon ce procédé, et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0971060 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401676 A

Priority

FR 9808739 A

Abstract (en)

The material for contact bonding strips, where the loops on one of the strips lock with hooks on the other, has a textile support (2) for the looped strip section and at least one filament (8) forming the loops at one side. The loop supports are on the other side. The length of each loop support lock is shorter than the length of its loop. The loop support locks are wholly in contact with the textile substrate, as a double loop. The feet of the double loops are at right angles to the textile strip (2). An Independent claim is included for a knitting operation to form the loops on the strip surface. Longitudinal columns of intermediate loops are formed on one side of the textile strip (2) and columns of stitches on the other side of it. The filament (8) is fed by guide needles (6) to one side while needles (3) draw the filament through and round pins (7) to give the loops. The pins (7) are shifted laterally (9) by a set distance, carrying the loops round them, to form a second intermediate loop. When the second loop has been made round the pins, they are given an opposing lateral shift movement (10), to carry both intermediate loops back by the same distance as the first displacement, for a third intermediate loop to be formed round them. The intermediate stitches are pulled, in a stage, to form the locking supports for the loops on the other side of the strip (2). Preferred Features: A coating of adhesive is applied to the rear surface of the textile strip (2), to bond the loop supports in place. The needles (3) are moved to and fro, through the textile strip (2), in cycles for the formation of the loops round the pins (7). The needles have structured longitudinal movements and latch closing actions to give a synchronized and cyclic action to form the loop structures on one side of the textile strip (2), locked in place at the other side.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé sert à former par tricotage des boucles (1) sur une feuille (2), entraînée sur un métier entre une barre d'aiguilles (3) et une barre de passettes (6). Une barre de lancettes (7) en porte-à-faux est adjacente soit aux aiguilles (3), soit aux passettes (6). Les boucles (1) sont réalisées d'un côté (11, 16) de la feuille (2) en faisant passer les fils de tricotage (8) sur les lancettes (7), et retenues sur la feuille (2) en faisant passer les fils (8) de l'autre côté (11, 16) de la feuille (2). A chaque cycle de tricotage, après la formation d'une première boucle (1) sur une lancette (7), et avant la formation d'une deuxième, on déplace transversalement la lancette (7) dans un sens (9). Au cycle suivant, après la formation de la deuxième boucle, on déplace à nouveau transversalement la lancette (7) dans le sens inverse (10) avant la formation d'une troisième boucle. Les boucles (1) du tissu produit sont droites. Ce tissu compose les fermetures auto-agrippantes utilisées pour les couches-culottes. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01); D04B 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/02 (2013.01); A44B 18/0034 (2013.01); D04B 21/165 (2013.01); D04B 23/08 (2013.01); D10B 2501/0632 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971060 A1 20000112; EP 0971060 B1 20031008; DE 69911857 D1 20031113; DE 69911857 T2 20040722; ES 2209355 T3 20040616; FR 2780989 A1 20000114; FR 2780989 B1 20001222; JP 2000070011 A 20000307; US 6209359 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060706

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *APLIX

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060706

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060705

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060705

2005-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209355 T3

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911857 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI