Global patent index - EP 0971072 A1

EP 0971072 A1 2000-01-12 - Method for making asphalt coverings

Title (en)

Method for making asphalt coverings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Asphaltbelages

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de revêtements d'asphalte

Publication

EP 0971072 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890230 A

Priority

AT 119898 A

Abstract (en)

A method for preparing asphalt paving without undue delay between preparing the base and applying the asphalt. The base is prepared by spraying a flux bitumen binder immediately before laying the asphalt. The binder is taken from a non heated tank and is heated prior to spraying by separate heaters on the supply lines to the spray heads, or by looping the supply lines through the reservoir of hot asphalt. The spray heads are applied in an alternating manner, with controlled overspray, to prevent clogging. The binder is applied with a thickness of 0.1 to 0.2 kg per square meter.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Asphaltbelages auf Flächen, wie Straßen, Wege und dgl., wobei als Bindemittel Fluxbitumen, welches wasserfrei und im wesentlichen lösungsmittelfrei ist, vorgespritzt wird und unmittelbar danach der Asphaltbelag aufgebracht wird. Erfindungsgemäß besteht die Vorrichtung zum Versprühen von Bindemittel vor dem Aufbringen eines Asphaltbelages aus einem unbeheizten Bindemitteltank, mindestens einer damit verbundenen beheizten Zuleitung und damit verbundenen Sprühdüsen. Aus einem herkömmlichen Asphaltfertiger, der mit einer Sprühvorrichtung mit Bindemitteltank der vorgenannten Art aus- bzw. nachgerüstet ist, kann erfindungsgemäß ein Deckenfertiger mit einem Heißmischgutbehälter und einem Bindemitteltank gebildet werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 7/18; E01C 19/17; E01C 19/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 7/18 (2006.01); E01C 19/17 (2006.01); E01C 19/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2013.01); E01C 7/185 (2013.01); E01C 19/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971072 A1 20000112; EP 0971072 B1 20030502; AT 407717 B 20010525; AT A119898 A 20001015; DE 59905286 D1 20030605; DK 0971072 T3 20030825; ES 2198877 T3 20040201

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59905286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110707

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110707

2012-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2012-03-29 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20030402973

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OESTERREICHISCHE *VIALIT G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: OESTERREICHISCHE VIALIT GESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Free Format Text: OESTERREICHISCHE VIALIT GESELLSCHAFT MBH#JOSEF REITER STR. 78#5280 BRAUNAU/INN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- OESTERREICHISCHE VIALIT GESELLSCHAFT MBH#JOSEF REITER STR. 78#5280 BRAUNAU/INN (AT)

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198877

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030402973

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-08-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-08-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59905286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030605

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011214

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI