Global patent index - EP 0971083 A2

EP 0971083 A2 2000-01-12 - Coupling piece for roof gutter parts

Title (en)

Coupling piece for roof gutter parts

Title (de)

Kupplungsstück für Dachrinnen

Title (fr)

Pièce d'accouplement pour gouttières

Publication

EP 0971083 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202174 A

Priority

  • NL 1009600 A
  • NL 1011231 A

Abstract (en)

Device for roof gutter parts (2a,2b) to be connected to each other, which roof gutter parts have a front wall (6a,6b), a bottom wall (3a,3b) and a rear wall (4a,4b), which merge into each other via discontinuities -such as buckles-, comprising two coupling members (8,9), which each substantially follow the shape of the roof gutter parts in cross-section, as well as means for biassing the coupling members to each other to hold the adjacent ends of the roof gutter parts in between them, the upper coupling member being provided with at least one receiving space, such as a channel, for attaching a sealing profile therein which profile is destined to lie on the ends of the roof gutter parts, the sealing profile being formed by injection moulding, the biassing means being adapted to exert a pressure force on the sealing profile to press it against the inner surface of the gutter wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0641 (2013.01); E04D 13/068 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

NL 7007068 A 19711117

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971083 A2 20000112; EP 0971083 A3 20000412; EP 0971083 B1 20040204; DE 69914541 D1 20040311; DE 69914541 T2 20041216

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080705

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080705

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-07-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69914541

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040311

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010724

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI