Global Patent Index - EP 0971085 A1

EP 0971085 A1 2000-01-12 - Method for repairing tiled floors and such floors

Title (en)

Method for repairing tiled floors and such floors

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reparieren von gefliesten Böden und derartiger Boden

Title (fr)

Méthode pour réparer des sols carrelés et tels sols

Publication

EP 0971085 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110119 A

Priority

DE 19830400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830400C1] The method of repairing building foundations involves drying a prelaid base layer and laying repair material in place in holes in the metalling. A layer of fiber reinforced plastics is laid on the upper surface and a further plastics layer (10) is poured onto this.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Reparieren von gefliesten Böden, wobei der vorhandene Bodenbelag getrocknet wird, anschließend seine Oberfläche aufgerauht wird, Hohl- und Schadstellen freigelegt, grundiert und mit Reparaturmaterial (4) ausgebessert werden, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß auf die so geschaffene Oberfläche eine Lage (7) aus glasfaserverstärktem Kunststoff aufgebracht wird und auf diese Lage (7) Fliesen (9) in Kunststoffmasse (10) verlegt und verfugt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/02 (2013.01); E04G 23/0285 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830400 C1 19991007; EP 0971085 A1 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031203

2000-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI