Global Patent Index - EP 0971087 A1

EP 0971087 A1 2000-01-12 - Padlock

Title (en)

Padlock

Title (de)

Vorhängeschloss

Title (fr)

Cadenas

Publication

EP 0971087 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305394 A

Priority

EP 98305394 A

Abstract (en)

A padlock includes a lock base (20) formed with first and second shackle insert holes (22, 21), a lock receiving space (23) which is disposed between the shackle insert holes (22, 21) and which has an upper section communicated with the second shackle insert hole (21), and a ball chamber (24) which extends transversely between the first shackle insert hole (22) and the lock receiving space (23). A lock device (50) is received in the lock receiving space (23), and has a key-operated lock core (51) which is provided with a plunger (53). A locking unit (28) includes at least one ball member (280) rollingly disposed in the ball chamber (24) adjacent to the plunger (53). A shackle (30) has longer and shorter leg portions (32, 34) to be received in the shackle insert holes (22, 21), respectively. The shorter leg portion (34) is formed with a plunger engaging groove (35) for engaging a latch projection (52) on the plunger (53). The longer leg portion (32) is formed with a ball retaining groove (35) for engaging the locking unit (28). A biasing spring (31) is disposed in the first shackle insert hole (22) for biasing the longer leg portion (32) upwardly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 67/24; E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 67/24 (2006.01); E05B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 67/24 (2013.01); E05B 9/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971087 A1 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060201

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030805

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI