Global Patent Index - EP 0971088 A1

EP 0971088 A1 2000-01-12 - Articulation device for motor vehicle hatchback with retention means in the closed position

Title (en)

Articulation device for motor vehicle hatchback with retention means in the closed position

Title (de)

Gelenkvorrichtung für Motorhaube von Kraftfahrzeugen mit Haltemittel in der geschlossenen Stellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'articulation d'un ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens de rétention en position fermée

Publication

EP 0971088 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401425 A

Priority

FR 9808823 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly consists of supporting arms (24), each with a forward end (28) pivoted to the vehicle body and a rear end pivoted to the door. The forward end of the arm has a door retaining lock in the form of an open hook (108) which engages with a transverse peg (110) on the side of the door when it is closed. The hook is pivoted to the forward end of the arm, is spring-loaded and is moved between rest and active positions by a control pin (116) fixed to a side support and interacting with a cam surface (114). When the hatchback door is in its fully open position the hook engages with a stop peg.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un dispositif d'articulation d'un hayon monté pivotant sur la caisse (12) d'un véhicule automobile (10) par l'intermédiaire d'un mécanisme à deux axes transversaux parallèles (A1) reliés par deux bielles longitudinales parallèles (24) d'articulation dont chacune comporte une première extrémité avant (28) articulée sur la caisse (12) autour d'un premier axe d'articulation (A1) caractérisé en ce que l'extrémité avant d'au moins une bielle (24) porte un pêne (80) de rétention du hayon (22) en forme de crochet ouvert (108) qui, en position de fermeture du hayon est accroché sur une gâche en forme de pion transversal (110) porté par un bord latéral du hayon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/40 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971088 A1 20000112; EP 0971088 B1 20041117; DE 69921902 D1 20041223; DE 69921902 T2 20050407; FR 2781005 A1 20000114; FR 2781005 B1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041117

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921902 P 20041223

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-10-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI