Global patent index - EP 0971092 A2

EP 0971092 A2 2000-01-12 - Tolerance deviation compensation device

Title (en)

Tolerance deviation compensation device

Title (de)

Toleranzausgleichsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de compensation de déviations de tolérance

Publication

EP 0971092 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111774 A

Priority

DE 19830503 A

Abstract (en)

The tolerance compensator has at least two parts- an upper (5) and a lower (4) sleeve - which are axially positioned and fixed in relation to each other. The two parts have holders (3,6) for the components. An axially set adjusting ring (14) is movably positioned on one of the parts. The lower sleeve has an externally threaded (21) guide core (18) holding the internally threaded adjusting ring. The guide core has an inner thread (20) into which a screw (17)is screwed to fixed the two parts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Toleranzausgleichsvorrichtung (1) zum Verbinden von Bauteilen, die zumindest zwei Teile (Unterhülse 4, Oberhülse 5) aufweist, wobei die Teile (4, 5) axial zueinander positionierbar und feststellbar sind sowie beide Teile (4, 5) mit Aufnahmen (3, 6) für die Bauteile verbunden sind, die gekennzeichnet ist durch einen axial einstellbaren Justagering (14), der verstellbar an einem der Teile (4, 5) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12; F16B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05F 15/616 (2013.01); E05F 15/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/538 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19803261 C1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971092 A2 20000112; EP 0971092 A3 20020424; DE 19830503 A1 20000113; DE 19830503 B4 20060518

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040413

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI