Global Patent Index - EP 0971098 A1

EP 0971098 A1 2000-01-12 - Engine with pneumatic or hydraulic valve actuator

Title (en)

Engine with pneumatic or hydraulic valve actuator

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit einem pneumatischen oder hydraulischen Aktuator für ein Gaswechsel-Hubventil

Title (fr)

Moteur muni d'actionneur de soupape à commande pneumatique ou hydraulique

Publication

EP 0971098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109776 A

Priority

DE 19829857 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has a lifting valve (2) with an operating connection via its shaft (2') to a piston (1) acted upon on both sides in a control chamber. The control vols. (3',3'') are connected to lines on both sides of the piston that are controlled by magnetic valves. Electromagnetic coaxial valves (5,6) are used and are arranged so that emptying and filling are effected via a single line (15,18) to each control vol.

Abstract (de)

Für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem pneumatischen und/oder hydraulischen Aktuator für ein Gaswechsel-Hubventil, das über einen in einer Steuerkammer (3) beidseitig beaufschlagbaren Kolben (1) steuerbar ist und die Steuerräume beiderseits des Kolbens über mittels Magnetventile gesteuerte Leitungen (15,18) ver- bzw. entsorgt sind, wird zur Erzielung hoher Schaltfrequenzen des Aktuators vorgeschlagen, daß als Magnetventile elektromagnetisch gesteuerte Koaxialventile dienen und diese derart angeordnet sind, daß mittels jeweils einer einzigen Leitung zu jedem Steuerraum das Füllen und Entleeren bewirkt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971098 A1 20000112; EP 0971098 B1 20030730; DE 19829857 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070518

2006-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906421 P 20030904

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI