Global patent index - EP 0971100 A1

EP 0971100 A1 2000-01-12 - Magnetic protection for an electromagnetic valve actuator

Title (en)

Magnetic protection for an electromagnetic valve actuator

Title (de)

Magnetische Abschirmung eines Aktors zur elektromagnetischen Ventilsteuerung

Title (fr)

Protection magnétique pour actionneur de soupape électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0971100 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112531 A

Priority

  • DE 19830233 A
  • DE 19843075 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator has an opening magnet (OM) and a closing magnet (SM) with an armature plate (AP) oscillating between them, and an armature plate position measurement arrangement with a magnetic field sensor (MS) and a magnetic field generator (MG). The magnetic field generator and the magnetic field sensor are enclosed by a magnetic screen (MA) made of a weakly magnetic material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Aktor zur elektromagnetischen Ventilsteuerung mit einer einen Magnetfeldsensor und einen Magnetfeldgeber aufweisenden Vorrichtung zur Positionsbestimmung der Ankerplatte, wobei der Magnetfeldsensor und der Magnetfeldgeber von einer magnetischen Abschirmung umgeben sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0436 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0469 (2013.01); Y10T 137/8242 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971100 A1 20000112; EP 0971100 B1 20030903; ES 2205648 T3 20040501; US 6213147 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-04-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2005-12-28 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-12-28 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20050808

2005-07-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-07-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FEV MOTORENTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205648

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59906828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031009

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI