Global Patent Index - EP 0971103 A1

EP 0971103 A1 2000-01-12 - A compression ignition type engine with a device for exhaust treatment

Title (en)

A compression ignition type engine with a device for exhaust treatment

Title (de)

Selbstzündende Brennkraftmaschine mit einer Einrichtung zum Nachbehandeln von Abgasen

Title (fr)

Moteur à allumage par compression avec un dispositif de traitement du gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 0971103 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112535 A

Priority

DE 19830275 A

Abstract (en)

A method for reducing nitrous oxides in the exhaust gases of IC engines, especially self igniting engines, has a jet (14) in the exhaust manifold to direct a narrow jet of diesel fuel into the cylinder, past the open exhaust valve. The additional diesel fuel mixes with the high temperature combustion gasses and is cracked to produce reduction gasses which enable the reduction catalyzer (10) to reduce the nitrous oxides. The diesel jet operates when the exhaust valve is open. At least one jet is required per group of cylinders.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine selbstzündende Brennkraftmaschine mit einer Einrichtung zum Nachbehandeln von Abgasen. Zur Reduzierung der NOx-Bestandteile des Abgases ist ein Reduktionskatalysator (10) vorgesehen. Als Reduktionsmittel dient Dieselkraftstoff, der durch eine im Abgasrohr (6) angeordnete spezielle Einspritzdüse (14), dosiert durch eine Steuereinheit (19), so eingebracht wird, daß er in dünnem Strahl (15) auf die Öffnung (16) des sich nach einem Arbeitsspiel der Brennkraftmaschine öffnenden Auslaßventils (9) gerichtet ist. Der so eingebrachte Kraftstoff wird durch Kracken und Verdampfen optimal als Reduktionsmittel für die Reduktion der im Reduktionskatalysator (10) gespeicherten NOx-Anteile des Abgases aufbereitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/20; F01N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0871 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 2610/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 19646643 C1 19980212 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 323 (M - 1624) 20 June 1994 (1994-06-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 304 (M - 526) 16 October 1986 (1986-10-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971103 A1 20000112; EP 0971103 B1 20021120; DE 19830275 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903446

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130701

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120712

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, US

- Document: DE 59903446

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, MICH., US

- Document: DE 59903446

- Effective date: 20110323

2009-12-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091105 AND 20091111

2009-11-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091029 AND 20091104

2009-04-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090305 AND 20090311

2009-03-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090219 AND 20090225

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903446 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI