Global patent index - EP 0971105 A3

EP 0971105 A3 2000-10-18 - Device for diminishing the IR-signature from outlets of hot air on the outside surface of movable objects

Title (en)

Device for diminishing the IR-signature from outlets of hot air on the outside surface of movable objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der IR-Signatur von Warmluftaustrittsbereichen der Aussenfläche ortsveränderlicher Objekte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de diminution de la IR-signature des sorties de l'air à la surface extérieure des objets mobiles

Publication

EP 0971105 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109666 A

Priority

DE 19821881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971105A2] The arrangement has a multiple-element air guiding arrangement (4) in the heat outlet area with an internal hollow chamber (7,8) filled with gas. The outer wall enclosing the hollow chamber has openings (10) which make a connection between the hollow chamber and the outer surface (12) of the air guidance element. An Independent claim is also included for a method of reducing the IR signature of heat outlet areas of the external surfaces of position-variable objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/035 (2013.01); F01P 11/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971105 A2 20000112; EP 0971105 A3 20001018; DE 19821881 A1 20000120; DE 19821881 C2 20021114

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DIMINISHING THE IR-SIGNATURE FROM OUTLETS OF HOT AIR ON THE OUTSIDE SURFACE OF MOVABLE OBJECTS

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI