Global Patent Index - EP 0971110 A4

EP 0971110 A4 2000-09-06 - STRATIFIED SCAVENGING TWO-CYCLE ENGINE

Title (en)

STRATIFIED SCAVENGING TWO-CYCLE ENGINE

Title (de)

ZWEITAKTMOTOR MIT SCHICHTSPÜLUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A DEUX TEMPS A BALAYAGE STRATIFIE

Publication

EP 0971110 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98944286 A

Priority

  • JP 9804360 W
  • JP 28783097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918338A1] A stratified scavenging two-cycle engine capable of meeting the regulation for an emission rate of THC in exhaust gases with a simple construction, comprising a cylinder (4) receiving a piston (1) vertically slidably and having an exhaust port (14) and a scavenging port (16) in a side wall thereof, a scavenging channel (22) connecting a crank chamber (8) and the scavenging port (16), an air supply flow passage (24) connected to the scavenging channel (22) for supplying an air via a check valve (26), and an air-fuel mixture supply flow passage (20) for supplying an air-fuel mixture to the crank chamber (8), wherein, during a suction stroke, in which the crank chamber (8) becomes negative in pressure, an air charging quantity ratio R = qa/Qf, which is a ratio of an air charging quantity qa flowing through the air supply flow passage (24), to an air-fuel mixture charging quantity Qf flowing through the air-fuel mixture supply flow passage (20), satisfies 0.7</=R</=1.4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 25/16; F02B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 17/00 (2006.01); F02B 25/14 (2006.01); F02B 25/16 (2006.01); F02B 25/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/14 (2013.01); F02B 17/00 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918338 A1 19990415; AU 9186898 A 19990427; EP 0971110 A1 20000112; EP 0971110 A4 20000906; JP H11107761 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011204

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMATSU ZENOAH CO.

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PETROLEUM ENERGY CENTER

2000-09-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE