Global Patent Index - EP 0971119 A2

EP 0971119 A2 2000-01-12 - Common-rail fuel-injection system

Title (en)

Common-rail fuel-injection system

Title (de)

Common-Rail-Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de combustible à rampe commune

Publication

EP 0971119 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305441 A

Priority

JP 19348898 A

Abstract (en)

A common-rail fuel-injection system is disclosed, in which varying the effective stroke of an actuator-operated valve (42) results in adjusting an amount of fuel leaking out of a pressure-control chamber (40), thereby controlling the fuel injection in compliance with the engine operating conditions. When the lift of the valve (42) is small and therefore the opening area of the valve (42) is less than the cross-sectioned area of a fuel leakage path (41), the leakage of high-pressure fuel out of the pressure is defined by the lift of the valve (42). According to the pressure fall in the pressure-control chamber (40), the lift of a needle valve (24) is regulated to thereby control the fuel-injection rating, namely, the quantity of fuel injected and the rate of change of the fuel-injection rating. An exciting signal applied to the actuator (65) to operate the its associated valve is determined in accordance with a desired fuel-injection rating or the like, which is found in compliance with the engine operating conditions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1806 (2013.01); F02D 41/2096 (2013.01); F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 63/0068 (2013.01); F02D 41/3845 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971119 A2 20000112; EP 0971119 A3 20020213; EP 0971119 B1 20040922; DE 69920338 D1 20041028; DE 69920338 T2 20051006; JP 2000027725 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080708

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920338 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI