Global Patent Index - EP 0971120 A2

EP 0971120 A2 2000-01-12 - Connecting element for a high-pressure pipe

Title (en)

Connecting element for a high-pressure pipe

Title (de)

Anschlusselement für eine Hochdruckleitung

Title (fr)

Elément de raccordement pour une conduite à haute pression

Publication

EP 0971120 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113229 A

Priority

DE 19831080 A

Abstract (en)

A connector for a high pressure line has a conical seat (5) into which is pressed the conical end (17) of the high pressure line. The conical seat forms the inside of a conical seal insert (4) which is pressed into the conical seat (6) in the end of the connector housing. The bore inside the connector is larger than the bore inside the high pressure line and allows fitting of an insert, e.g. a filter element (3) which is clamped between an inner shoulder (14), inside the housing, and insert clamps (13) fitted into the housing. The conical seal insert has limited elasticity and ductability.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Anschlußelement für eine Hochdruckleitung beschrieben, wobei die Hochdruckleitung (16) einen Innendurchmesser d hat und eine ballig oder als Außenkonus ausgebildete Dichtfläche (17) aufweist und das Anschlußelement (1) eine damit zusammenwirkende, als Innenkonus ausgebildete Dichtfläche (5) aufweist und einen größeren Querschnitt als die Hochdruckleitung (16) hat und Mittel vorgesehen sind, um Hochdruckleitung (16) und Anschlußelement (1) zur Abdichtung gegeneinander in Axialrichtung unter Spannung zu setzen. Erfindungsgemäß ist die als Innenkonus ausgebildete Dichtfläche (5) des Anschlußelements (1) an einem als Doppelkonus (4) ausgebildeten Bereich eines in den Körper (2) des Anschlußelements (1) einsetzbaren Einsatzteils (3) vorgesehen, wobei der Doppelkonus (4) des Einsatzteils (3) eine als Außenkonus ausgebildete Dichtfläche (6) aufweist, welche mit einer am Körper (2) des Anschlußelements (1) vorgesehenen, als Innenkonus ausgebildeten Dichtfläche (7) zusammenwirkt, und wobei der Doppelkonus (4) die Erweiterung vom Querschnitt der Hochdruckleitung (16) auf den Querschnitt des Anschlußelements (1) überbrückt. Vorzugsweise ist in dem größeren Querschnitt des Anschlußelements (1) ein Einbauraum (8) zur Unterbringung eines Funktionselements (9), wie eines Filterelements vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/00; F16L 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/165 (2013.01); F02M 55/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971120 A2 20000112; EP 0971120 A3 20010801; EP 0971120 B1 20030312; AT 234427 T 20030315; DE 19831080 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070708

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060708

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060708

2006-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060708

2005-07-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904514

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE GB IT LI

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI