Global patent index - EP 0971123 A2

EP 0971123 A2 2000-01-12 - Fuel injection pump

Title (en)

Fuel injection pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 0971123 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113205 A

Priority

DE 19831078 A

Abstract (en)

A high pressure fuel pump for an IC engine, e.g. for a diesel engine, has a piston (2) driven by a camshaft and with its upper end (5) bounded by the high pressure chamber (3). A duct through the piston links input control ducts (4a,4b) to control the timing of the fuel pulses. The duct has an upper edge (6) and a sloping lower edge (7a) to define the start and closing points of the fuel timing. The rotational setting of the piston varies the closing setting of the pump. A bypass duct (20) provides a controlled bypass flow at the bottom of the sloping duct to provide a controlled termination of the fuel pulse, and hence a reduction in cavitation.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem in einem Pumpenzylinder (1) geführten Pumpenkolben (2) und einem von dem Pumpenkolben (2) begrenzten Druckraum (3) und mit Steuerbohrungen (4a, 4b) beschrieben, wobei der Pumpenkolben (2) obere und untere Steuerkanten (6, 7a, 7b) aufweist, welche durch Überstreichen der Steuerbohrungen (4a, 4b) Beginn und Ende der Kraftstofförderung der Einspritzpumpe festlegen. Erfindungsgemäß ist im Bereich der unteren Steuerkante (7a, 7b) an dem Pumpenkolben (2) eine Vorabsteuernut (20a, 20b) ausgebildet, welche beim Überstreichen der Steuerbohrungen (4a, 4b) früher als die untere Steuerkante (7a, 7b) die Steuerbohrung (4a, 4b) im Sinne einer Beendigung der Kraftstofförderung freigibt, wobei eine vom Kolbenkopf (5) zu der Vorabsteuernut (20a, 20b) führende Strömungsverbindung vorgesehen ist, welche Mittel zur Strömungsbegrenzung aufweist. Durch die erfindungsgemäße Ausgestaltung der Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe wird Kavitation und damit verbundener Schaden im Bereich der Steuerkanten und der Steuerbohrungen vermindert oder ganz vermieden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/265 (2013.01); F02M 55/001 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4304084 C2

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971123 A2 20000112; EP 0971123 A3 20010418; EP 0971123 B1 20030507; AT 239868 T 20030515; DE 19831078 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070713

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59905415

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030612

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE GB IT LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 02M 59/26 A, 7F 02M 55/00 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI