Global patent index - EP 0971127 A1

EP 0971127 A1 2000-01-12 - Piston speed modulation for a concrete pump

Title (en)

Piston speed modulation for a concrete pump

Title (de)

Veränderung der Kolbengeschwindigkeit in einer Betonpumpe

Title (fr)

Variation de la vitesse de course des pistons d'une pompe à béton

Publication

EP 0971127 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113575 A

Priority

IT MI981571 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a concrete pump, of the type comprising a pair of pumping cylinders alternatively operating under the control of a backflow hydraulic pump - to draw concrete from a hopper and feed it, by way of a rocking valve (S-valve), into the transport and delivery duct - wherein said cylinders are provided with stops to control the starting movement of the S-valve. According to the invention, the speed of the piston stroke of said cylinders is modulated by being increased in the initial length of said stroke, and electronic means are provided to control said speed according to the maximum concrete capacity allowed by the pump. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2013.01); F04B 2201/0202 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971127 A1 20000112; EP 0971127 B1 20070321; AT 357596 T 20070415; CY 1107646 T1 20130418; DE 69935551 D1 20070503; DE 69935551 T2 20071129; DK 0971127 T3 20070716; ES 2284229 T3 20071101; IT MI981571 A1 20000110; PT 971127 E 20070626

INPADOC legal status

2013-08-20 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2013-01-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA03

- Ref Document Number: 357596

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120407

2012-11-20 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070321

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070321

2012-10-11 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 69935551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121011

2012-08-17 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20120813

2012-08-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120407

2012-08-15 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20120407

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-04-07 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 69935551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-04-07 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 69935551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.

- Free Format Text: COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.#VIA STATI UNITI D'AMERICA 26#20030 SENAGO (MILANO) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.#VIA STATI UNITI D'AMERICA 26#20030 SENAGO (MILANO) (IT)

2010-12-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2009-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

2009-09-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Effective date: 20071219

2009-09-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

2009-03-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Effective date: 20071219

2009-03-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2008-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

2008-02-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-02-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2284229

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2007-07-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2007-06-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.

- Free Format Text: COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.#VIA STATI UNITI D'AMERICA 26.#20030 SENAGO (MILANO) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.#VIA STATI UNITI D'AMERICA 26#20030 SENAGO (MILANO) (IT)

2007-06-26 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-06-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20070401545

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69935551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20070503

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNIA ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO S.P.A.

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI