Global patent index - EP 0971169 A1

EP 0971169 A1 2000-01-12 - COMBUSTION CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WASTE INCINERATORS

Title (en)

COMBUSTION CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WASTE INCINERATORS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBRENNUNGSREGELUNG VON ABFALLVERBRENNUNGÖFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE LA COMBUSTION ET DISPOSITIF POUR INCINERATEURS DE DECHETS

Publication

EP 0971169 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942222 A

Priority

  • JP 9703518 W
  • JP 7356197 A

Abstract (en)

A combustion control method for waste incinerators, developed for the purpose of reducing the concentrations of CO and NOx in a waste gas and a generation rate of dioxine. The condition of the waste on a post-combustion fire grate (3c) is judged on the basis of measurement values on a main flue thermometer (14), an O2 analyser (16), a CO concentration meter (17) and a barometer (18a) which is set under the post-combustion fire grate. Thus, the possibility that the apparatus will get into an insufficient temperature condition, or an air or fuel shortage condition is judged quickly, and the flow rate of the air to the post-combustion fire grate (3c), or the flow rate of the air to the same fire grate (3c) and the moving speed of the fire grate are controlled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/50 (2006.01); F23N 3/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/022 (2013.01); F23G 5/50 (2013.01); F23N 3/002 (2013.01); F23N 5/003 (2013.01); F23N 5/006 (2013.01); F23G 2207/101 (2013.01); F23G 2207/102 (2013.01); F23G 2207/103 (2013.01); F23G 2207/104 (2013.01); F23G 2207/30 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55003 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55008 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55009 (2013.01); F23N 2023/52 (2013.01); F23N 2025/04 (2013.01); F23N 2025/10 (2013.01); F23N 2035/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/12 (2013.01); F23N 2037/32 (2013.01); F23N 2041/18 (2013.01); Y02E 20/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0496325 A1
  • [A] EP 0312818 A2
  • [A] EP 0427231 A2
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 342 (M-536), 19 November 1986 (1986-11-19) & JP 61 143615 A (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP), 1 July 1986 (1986-07-01)
  • See also references of WO 9843018A1

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1382906 A2 20040121; EP 1382906 A3 20040128; EP 0971169 A1 20000112; EP 0971169 A4 20000412; JP 3319327 B2 20020826; JP H10267245 A 19981009; KR 20000022068 A 20000425; WO 9843018 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE ENGINEERING CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020723

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990119

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB