Global Patent Index - EP 0971172 A1

EP 0971172 A1 2000-01-12 - Gas turbine combustion chamber with silencing wall structure

Title (en)

Gas turbine combustion chamber with silencing wall structure

Title (de)

Brennkammer für eine Gasturbine mit schalldämpfender Wandstruktur

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion pour turbine à gaz avec paroi à structure silencieuse

Publication

EP 0971172 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810656 A

Priority

EP 98810656 A

Abstract (en)

The inner walls (12,17) enclosing the combustion zone (23) are cooled by cooling air supplied from outside. A perforated plate (24) parallel with the inner walls is positioned in part of the outside of the inner walls and is spaced apart from them. The perforated plate with one inner wall (17) which has first openings (27) in it, forms an enclosed damping volume (26). The perforated plate has second openings (25) in it for bringing cool air from outside.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Brennkammer (10) für eine Gasturbine, in welcher Brennkammer (10) die heissen Verbrennungsgase einer Verbrennungszone (23) durch Innenwände (12, 17) umschlossen werden, welche durch ausserhalb der Innenwände (12, 17) herangeführte Kühlluft gekühlt werden, wird eine gleichzeitige effiziente akustische Dämpfung und Kühlung dadurch erreicht, dass zumindest in einem Teilbereich an der Aussenseite der Innenwände (12, 17) eine von den Innenwänden (12, 17) beabstandete, im wesentlichen parallel zu den Innenwänden (12, 17) verlaufende Lochplatte (24) angeordnet ist, welche zusammen mit der zugehörigen Innenwand (17) ein geschlossenes Dämpfungsvolumen (26) bildet, dass die Innenwände (17) im Bereich des Dämpfungsvolumens (26) eine Mehrzahl von verteilt angeordneten ersten Oeffnungen (27) aufweist, durch welche das Dämpfungsvolumen (26) mit der Verbrennungszone (23) der Brennkammer (10) in Verbindung steht, dass die Lochplatte (24) eine Mehrzahl von verteilt angeordneten zweiten Oeffnungen (25) aufweist, durch welche Kühlluft von aussen in das Dämpfungsvolumen (26) einströmt und nach Art einer Prallkühlung zwischen den ersten Oeffnungen (27) auf die gegenüberliegende Aussenseite der Innenwand (17) trifft, und dass der Abstand zwischen der Lochplatte (24) und der Innenwand (12) und die geometrischen Abmessungen der ersten Oeffnungen (27) so gewählt sind, dass die ersten Oeffnungen (27) zusammen mit den Dämpfungsvolumen (26) eine Mehrzahl von untereinander verbundenen Helmholtzresonatoren bilden und als Schalldämpfer für in der Brennkammer entstehende akustische Schwingungen wirken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/00; F01N 1/02; F02B 77/13; F02M 35/12; G10K 11/172

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/02 (2006.01); F02B 77/13 (2006.01); F02M 35/12 (2006.01); F23M 99/00 (2010.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); G10K 11/168 (2006.01); G10K 11/172 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/1261 (2013.01); F01N 1/02 (2013.01); F01N 1/023 (2013.01); F02B 77/13 (2013.01); F23M 20/005 (2013.01); F23R 3/002 (2013.01); G10K 11/168 (2013.01); G10K 11/172 (2013.01); F01N 2490/155 (2013.01); F05B 2260/201 (2013.01); F05B 2260/96 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971172 A1 20000112; EP 0971172 B1 20031203; DE 59810343 D1 20040115

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810343

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120710

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810343 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI