Global patent index - EP 0971173 A1

EP 0971173 A1 2000-01-12 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR PROGRAM-CONTROLLED HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES with a country program list

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR PROGRAM-CONTROLLED HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES with a country program list

Title (de)

Steuerungsanordnung für ein programmgesteuertes Haushaltsgerät mit Landesprogrammlisten

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR APPAREILS ELECTROMENAGERS COMMANDES PAR PROGRAMME comportant des listes de programme spécifique à un pays

Publication

EP 0971173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113145 A

Priority

DE 19830844 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an input unit (5) to select a control program from a list stored in memory with programs (15) or descriptors (21). A displayed program list has country-specific programs or descriptor sequences. The arrangement has a display with an input unit (5) to select a desired country program list, whose different successively stored control programs or descriptors can be displayed to explain the control programs. The input unit can also be used to select an individual control program from the selected list. The country program lists are stored in a memory with the control programs (15) or descriptors (21). The displayed program list has a country-specific sequence of control programs or descriptors. An Independent claim is also included for a household device, especially a cooker or washing machine

Abstract (de)

Steuerungsanordnung für ein programmgesteuertes Haushaltsgerät mit einer Anzeige, mit einer Eingabeeinheit zum Auswählen einer gewünschten Landesprogrammliste, deren verschiedene nacheinander gespeicherte Steuerprogramme bzw. Steuerprogrammdeskriptoren zur Erläuterung der Steuerprogramme anzeigbar sind, welche Eingabeeinheit weiterhin zum Auswählen eines einzelnen Steuerprogrammes aus der ausgewählten Landesprogrammliste dient, und mit einem Speicherelement, in dem die Landesprogrammlisten mit den jeweiligen Steuerprogrammen und den Steuerprogrammdeskriptoren gespeichert sind. Um den Bedienkomfort zu erhöhen, weisen die angezeigten Landesprogrammlisten jeweils eine landesspezifische Reihenfolge der Steuerprogramme bzw. der Steuerprogrammdiskreptoren auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5495095 A
  • PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 183 (M-235)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971173 A1 20000112; EP 0971173 B1 20031015; EP 0971173 B2 20160615; DE 19830844 A1 20000113; ES 2209289 T3 20040616; ES 2209289 T5 20160714

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-14 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209289

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20160714

2016-06-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20160615

2016-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2016-06-15 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59907345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59907345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-03-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2005-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO.SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAE

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-09-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO.SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAE

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209289

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59907345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031120

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: CONTROL DEVICE FOR PROGRAM-CONTROLLED HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES WITH A COUNTRY PROGRAM LIST

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI