Global patent index - EP 0971179 A1

EP 0971179 A1 2000-01-12 - Heat exchanger and heating apparatus of improved efficiency

Title (en)

Heat exchanger and heating apparatus of improved efficiency

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher und Heizgerät mit verbessertem Wirkungsgrad

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur et appareil de chauffage avec rendement amélioré

Publication

EP 0971179 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202199 A

Priority

NL 1009570 A

Abstract (en)

A heat exchanger comprising a burner space (2), a flue duct (14) connected to the burner space (2), and a water duct (12), wherein the water duct (12) and the flue duct (14) are at least partly interwoven, such that a part of the water duct (12) is at least partly surrounded on at least three sides by the flue duct (14). A heating apparatus comprising such a heat exchanger, wherein at least the flue duct (14) is at least partly closed off from the surroundings by covering parts which are relatively easily removable for inspection and maintenance of the flue duct portion in question, preferably such that upon removal of the covering parts, the whole flue duct is accessible from the surroundings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28; F24H 1/44; F28F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01); F24H 1/44 (2006.01); F28F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/40 (2013.01); F24H 1/26 (2013.01); F24H 1/287 (2013.01); F24H 1/44 (2013.01); F28F 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971179 A1 20000112; NL 1009570 C2 20000110

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI