Global Patent Index - EP 0971180 A2

EP 0971180 A2 2000-01-12 - Heating system with a central solid storage

Title (en)

Heating system with a central solid storage

Title (de)

Heizungssytem aus einem Zentralnachtspeicher auf Feststoffbasis

Title (fr)

Système de chauffage avec accummulateur de chaleur solide

Publication

EP 0971180 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112894 A

Priority

DE 19830454 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a central night storage device (7) with heat output by air circulation or thermal radiation. A following air-water heat exchanger (2) is connected after the storage device. An absorbent surface (4) mounted on storage insulation (6) in the central night storage device has an integral absorber pipe system (3) fed via pipelines into the heat exchanger. A parallel air circulation system (24) is fed as a circuit through the central storage device and heat exchanger.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Heizungssystem aus einem Zentralnachtspeicher (7) auf Feststoffbasis, wobei über Absorberrohrsysteme (3) und Umluftsystem (24) die gespeicherte Wärmeenergie in einem Wärmetauscher (2), an welchem ein Warmwasserheizungssystem angeschlossen ist, übertragen wird. Dabei ist gegeben, daß der Zentralnachtspeicher (7) an einem zentralen Ort positioniert wird und über diesen zentralen Nachtspeicher (7) ein Warmwassersystem als Heizungsanlage betrieben wird, da die gespeicherte Wärmeenergie in einem Wärmetauscher (2) auf das Warmwasserheizungssystem abgegeben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 7/0433 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

"TASCHENBUCH FÜR HEIZUNG UND KLIMA", vol. 90/91, article RECKNAGEL, SPRENGER, HÖHNMANN, pages: 366 - 582

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971180 A2 20000112; EP 0971180 A3 20020522; DE 19830454 A1 20000217; DE 19830454 C2 20000608; NO 993352 A 20000110; NO 993352 D0 19990707

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24H 7/04 A, 7F 24D 11/00 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI